VA SB47 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0549)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Female genital mutilation; criminal penalty. Increases from a Class 1 misdemeanor to a Class 2 felony the penalty for any person to knowingly circumcise, excise, or infibulate the labia majora, labia minora, or clitoris of a minor; for any parent or guardian charged with the care of a minor to consent to such circumcision, excision, or infibulation; or for any parent or guardian charged with the care of a minor to knowingly remove or cause or permit the removal of such minor from the Commonwealth for the purposes of performing such circumcision, excision, or infibulation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Female genital mutilation; increases criminal penalty to Class 2 felony.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-30 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0549)
2018-03-30 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 549 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-20SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 20, 2018
2018-03-12SenateSigned by President
2018-03-10HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-10SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB47ER)
2018-03-10SenateEnrolled
2018-03-08SenateHouse amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-03-07HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-03-07HousePassed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-03-07HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2018-03-07HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2018-03-07HouseRead third time
2018-03-06HouseRead second time
2018-03-02HouseReported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
2018-03-01HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N)
2018-02-26HouseAssigned App. sub: Public Safety
2018-02-23HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2018-02-23HouseReported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N)
2018-02-19HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2018-02-19HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2018-02-16HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-02-08HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-02-08HouseRead first time
2018-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-05SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-02SenatePrinted as engrossed 18100163D-E
2018-02-02SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB47E
2018-02-02SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2018-02-02SenateReading of amendment waived
2018-02-02SenateRead second time
2018-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-01-31SenateReported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
2018-01-22SenateRereferred to Finance
2018-01-22SenateReported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
2017-11-22SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2017-11-22SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100163D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
18251.7(n/a)See Bill Text
1928(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+SB47
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB47+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB47E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB47ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0549+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S03V0123+SB0047
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S05V0083+SB0047
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0249SB0047+SB0047
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0268SB0047+SB0047
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H0801V0171+SB0047
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H08V0590+SB0047
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H0207V0022+SB0047
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H02V0207+SB0047
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1410+SB0047
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1068SB0047+SB0047

Bill Comments

feedback