VA SB467 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0467)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0467)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Protective orders; coordination with other states. Requires the Executive Secretary of the Supreme Court, on an annual basis, to consult with the appropriate judicial authorities of adjacent states, and allows the Executive Secretary to consult with the appropriate judicial authorities of any other state, concerning the forms used in connection with the issuance of protective orders under the laws of the Commonwealth and the other states. The Executive Secretary shall, to the extent feasible under the laws of the Commonwealth, coordinate the contents of such protective order forms with other states in order to facilitate the enforcement of foreign protective orders in the Commonwealth and the enforcement of Virginia protective orders in other states.
Title
Protective orders; coordination with other states.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-05 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0467) | |
2010-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 467 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-13 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-12 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-12 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB467ER) | |
2010-03-12 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-03-05 | Senate: Title replaced 10105562D-H1 | |
2010-03-05 | Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-03 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-03 | House: Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-03 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB467H1 | |
2010-03-03 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 10105562D-H1 | |
2010-03-03 | House: Read third time | |
2010-03-02 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-26 | House: Committee substitute printed 10105562D-H1 | |
2010-02-26 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (19-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-22 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-17 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal | |
2010-02-16 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-02-16 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-16 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-10 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-08 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-15 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2010-01-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-01-13 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103488D |
Same As/Similar To
HB931 (Same As) 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0426)