VA SB465 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 15 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-16 - Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Donation by locality of in-kind resources to certain volunteer or nonprofit organizations. Expands the scope of permitted in-kind donations by a locality to include the provision of in-kind resources for contract management services for capital projects; assistance in preparing requests for information, bids, or proposals; and budgeting services to any association or other organization furnishing voluntary firefighting services or a nonprofit or volunteer emergency medical services agency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Volunteer or nonprofit organizations, certain; donation by locality of in-kind resources.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional readings dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-16SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-01-15SenateRead second time and engrossed
2020-01-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2020-01-13SenateReported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N)
2020-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on Local Government
2020-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102326D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
152953(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback