VA SB462 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Members of the Virginia National Guard; education grants. Provides that the cost of textbooks will be included in the calculation of the amount of Virginia National Guard education grants, and clarifies that the eligibility requirement of a two-year remaining obligation is from the last day of the semester or term for which the grant is awarded. This bill incorporates SB 849.
Title
Virginia National Guard; education grants for members.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2018-02-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2019 by voice vote |
2018-02-22 | House | Assigned App. sub: Higher Education |
2018-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB462S2 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18105837D-S2 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute rejected 18105491D-S1 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Incorporates SB849 (Cosgrove) |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18105837D-S2 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Incorporates SB849 (Cosgrove) |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18105491D-S1 |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100096D |