VA SB462 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0480)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0480)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Income tax; conformity with § 199 of the Internal Revenue Code. Allows the entire amount of the deduction allowed for domestic production activities pursuant to § 199 of the Internal Revenue Code to be deducted for Virginia income tax purposes for taxable years beginning on and after January 1, 2013.
Title
Income tax, state; conformity with federal law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0480) | |
2012-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 480 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-07 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-05 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-05 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB462ER) | |
2012-03-05 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2012-02-29 | Senate: Title replaced 12105591D-H1 | |
2012-02-29 | Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-27 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-27 | House: Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-27 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB462H1 | |
2012-02-27 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 12105591D-H1 | |
2012-02-27 | House: Read third time | |
2012-02-24 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-22 | House: Committee substitute printed 12105591D-H1 | |
2012-02-22 | House: Reported from Finance with substitute (20-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-16 | House: Assigned Finance sub: #2 | |
2012-02-15 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2012-02-15 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-15 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-10 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 12102484D-E | |
2012-02-10 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB462E | |
2012-02-10 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2012-02-10 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2012-02-10 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-08 | Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2012-01-11 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102484D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1153 (Same As) 2012-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0335)