VA SB462 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-08 - House: Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (10-Y 10-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-08 - House: Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (10-Y 10-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Crime victims; immigration status. Provides that no law-enforcement officer or other agent of state or local government shall, when investigating a crime, inquire into the immigration status of any person who reports that he is the victim of the crime or the parent or guardian of a minor victim, or is a cooperating witness in the criminal investigation or the parent or guardian of a minor witness. The bill does not prohibit a law-enforcement officer from inquiring into the immigration status of a victim or witness who has been arrested or charged with a criminal violation, or when such inquiry is required by federal law or is essential to the investigation or prosecution of the crime to which the person is a witness or of which the person is a victim.
Title
Crime victims; no law-enforcement officer shall inquire into immigration status thereof.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-08 - House - House: Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (10-Y 10-N) (Y: 10 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-03-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 4-N) (Y: 5 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 4-N) (Y: 5 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | House: Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (10-Y 10-N) | |
2010-03-05 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 4-N) | |
2010-02-17 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal | |
2010-02-16 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-02-16 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-16 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-01-26 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-01-22 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-20 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-14 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2010-01-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-01-13 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101329D |