VA SB455 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0427)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0427)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Calculation of gross income for determination of child support; rental income. Provides that for the calculation of gross income for the purposes of determining child support, rental income shall be subject to the deduction of reasonable expenses. The bill further provides that the party claiming any such deduction has the burden of proof to establish such expenses by a preponderance of the evidence. This bill is in response to Ellis v. Sutton-Ellis, Va. App. No. 0710-20-1 (June 22, 2021). Calculation of gross income for determination of child support; rental income. Provides that for the calculation of gross income for the purposes of determining child support, rental income shall be subject to the deduction of reasonable expenses. The bill further provides that the party claiming any such deduction has the burden of proof to establish such expenses by a preponderance of the evidence. This bill is in response to Ellis v. Sutton-Ellis, Va. App. No. 0710-20-1 (June 22, 2021).
Title
Child support; calculation of gross income for determination, rental income.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0427) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 427 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House reprinted (SB455ER) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB455ER) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-03 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-01 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-01 | House | Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-01 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2022-03-01 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2022-03-01 | House | Read third time |
2022-02-28 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-25 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (20-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-22 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101711D |