VA SB452 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Motor vehicle fuels sales tax in certain counties and cities. Imposes a regional motor vehicle fuels sales tax at a rate of 7.6 cents per gallon and gasoline and 7.7 cents per gallon of diesel fuel in any county or city outside of the Northern Virginia or Hampton Roads regions or the Interstate 81 Corridor, where such a tax is already imposed. The new revenues will be returned to the transportation district in which the revenues are generated via the construction district grant program. The bill also converts the existing regional motor vehicle fuels sales in Northern Virginia, Hampton Roads, and the Interstate 81 Corridor from tax from a percentage of the distributor price of a gallon of gasoline to this same cents per gallon rate. The rate will be indexed each year beginning July 1, 2021.
Title
Motor vehicle fuels; sales tax in certain counties and cities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Finance (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Finance (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 15-N) (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Finance (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 15-N) (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2020-02-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-19 | House | Reported from Finance (13-Y 9-N) |
2020-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2020-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 15-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB452S1 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20107603D-S1 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20107603D-S1 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Incorporates SB596 (Hanger) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (13-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Moved from Finance to Finance and Appropriations due to a change of the committee name |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102450D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 2295.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 2299.20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |