VA SB450 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0622)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Battlefield property; transfer of easements to United States. Directs the Secretary of Natural Resources (the Secretary) to endeavor to enter into a memorandum of understanding (MOU) with the United States to accomplish the transfer of the Commonwealth's easement interests in battlefield lands located within the boundaries of federal battlefield parks. The bill directs the Secretary to report on the status of the MOU to certain Senate and House committee chairmen by October 1, 2018. The bill is identical to HB 61.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Battlefields; entry into an agreement to transfer certain easements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-30 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0622)
2018-03-30 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 622 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-16 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-16SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 16, 2018
2018-03-10SenateSigned by President
2018-03-08HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-08SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB450ER)
2018-03-08SenateEnrolled
2018-03-06SenateTitle replaced 18107034D-H1
2018-03-06SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-03-05HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2018-03-05HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2018-03-05HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB450H1
2018-03-05HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 18107034D-H1
2018-03-05HouseRead third time
2018-03-02HouseRead second time
2018-02-28HouseCommittee substitute printed 18107034D-H1
2018-02-28HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2018-01-23HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2018-01-23HouseRead first time
2018-01-23HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-01-18SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2018-01-17SenatePassed by for the day
2018-01-16SenateRead second time and engrossed
2018-01-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-01-11SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N)
2018-01-09SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2018-01-09SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104461D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1012202.5(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+SB450
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB450+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB450H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB450ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0622+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S01V0010+SB0450
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0020SB0450+SB0450
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0058SB0450+SB0450
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H01V0133+SB0450
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1261+SB0450
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0954SB0450+SB0450

Bill Comments

feedback