VA SB448 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0499)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Abandoned school revitalization zones. Allows localities to establish by ordinance one or more abandoned school revitalization zones for the purpose of providing incentives to private entities to purchase or develop real property or to assemble parcels suitable for economic development that include an abandoned school site. Each locality establishing an abandoned school revitalization zone may grant incentives and provide regulatory flexibility. The incentives may include, but not be limited to, (i) reduction of permit fees, (ii) reduction of user fees, (iii) reduction of any type of gross receipts tax or any other type of local tax as permitted by state law, and (iv) waiver of tax liens to facilitate the sale of property, if deemed appropriate. A school located in an abandoned school revitalization zone shall be eligible for participation in the Virginia Shell Building Initiative. This bill is identical to HB 1179.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Abandoned schools; creation of revitalization zones.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-29 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0499)
2018-03-29 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 499 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-16 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-16SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 16, 2018
2018-03-10SenateSigned by President
2018-03-08HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-08SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB448ER)
2018-03-08SenateEnrolled
2018-03-06HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2018-03-06HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2018-03-06HouseRead third time
2018-03-05HouseRead second time
2018-03-02HouseReported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N)
2018-02-28HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2018-02-26HouseAssigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-02-15HouseReferred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
2018-02-15HouseRead first time
2018-02-15HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-12SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-09SenatePrinted as engrossed 18104349D-E
2018-02-09SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB448E
2018-02-09SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2018-02-09SenateReading of amendments waived
2018-02-09SenateRead second time
2018-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-07SenateReported from Finance with amendments (16-Y 0-N)
2018-01-30SenateRereferred to Finance
2018-01-30SenateReported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N)
2018-01-09SenateReferred to Committee on Local Government
2018-01-09SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104349D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
152941.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+SB448
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB448+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB448E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB448ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0499+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S07V0033+SB0448
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S05V0167+SB0448
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0404SB0448+SB0448
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0368SB0448+SB0448
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H0701V0038+SB0448
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H07V0116+SB0448
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1316+SB0448

Bill Comments

feedback