VA SB447 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-07 - Continued to 2017 in Appropriations by voice vote
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-07 - Continued to 2017 in Appropriations by voice vote
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Office of the Attorney General; employment of special counsel. Provides that when entering into a contract with special counsel, the Office of the Governor or Office of the Attorney General, as applicable, must make a copy of the contract available to the public on the website of the Governor or the Attorney General. However, the Attorney General may temporarily not disclose such information upon making a written determination that such action is necessary to protect attorney-client or otherwise privileged information or that immediate disclosure of the existence of special counsel, or any other sensitive information, could compromise the initiation, handling, or conclusion of any investigation or case matter handled by the Attorney General or special counsel and might put the Commonwealth and its citizens at a disadvantage. The bill also provides that prior to entering into a contract with special counsel, the Attorney General must make a written determination that the representation is both cost effective and in the public interest. In addition, the bill (i) requires the Governor and the Attorney General to submit an annual report to the General Assembly describing the use of contracts for special counsel; (ii) provides that the Attorney General, or counsel to the Governor in cases in which the Attorney General has a conflict, shall retain control over special counsel; and (iii) limits the contingency fee that may be charged by special counsel depending on the amount recovered.
Title
Attorney General, Offices of; employment of special counsel.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 2-N) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 18-N 1-A) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 2-N) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 18-N 1-A) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-07 | House | Continued to 2017 in Appropriations by voice vote |
2016-03-03 | House | Assigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay |
2016-03-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-03-02 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 7-N) |
2016-02-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 2-N) |
2016-02-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2016-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 18-N 1-A) |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-18 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (9-Y 6-N) |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101750D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 507 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 510 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 510.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 510.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |