VA SB44 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0579)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0579)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public elementary and secondary school students; topical sunscreen. Permits any public elementary or secondary school student to possess and use topical sunscreen in its original packaging on a school bus, on school property, or at a school-sponsored event without a note or prescription from a licensed health care professional if the topical sunscreen is approved by the U.S. Food and Drug Administration for nonprescription use for the purpose of limiting damage to skin caused by exposure to ultraviolet light.
Title
Public elementary and secondary school students; use of topical sunscreen, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Education (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Education (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-31 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0579) | |
2020-03-31 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 579 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 10, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB44ER) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-24 | House | VOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Passed House (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-21 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-19 | House | Reported from Education (20-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-12 | House | Assigned Education sub: Pre-K-12 |
2020-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100244D |