VA SB439 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1007)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1007)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Driving under the influence; remote alcohol monitoring; penalty. Provides that in the case of an adult offender's first conviction of driving under the influence when the offender's blood alcohol content was less than 0.15, upon motion of the offender, the sole restriction of the offender's restricted driver's license shall be the prohibition of the offender from operating any motor vehicle not equipped with a functioning, certified ignition interlock system for one year without any violation of the ignition interlock system requirements. The bill provides that if a person is ineligible to receive a restricted license, a court may instead authorize such person to use a remote alcohol monitoring device, refrain from alcohol consumption, and participate in an alcohol safety action program; such provisions of the bill shall become effective on July 1, 2021. The bill provides that tampering with a remote alcohol monitoring device is a Class 1 misdemeanor.
Title
Driving under the influence; remote alcohol monitoring, penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (68-Y 29-N) (Y: 68 N: 29 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (68-Y 29-N) (Y: 68 N: 29 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1007) | |
2020-04-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1007 (effective - see bill) | |
2020-03-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 17, 2020 |
2020-03-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB439ER) |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Title replaced 20108106D-H1 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | VOTE: Passage (68-Y 29-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Passed House with substitute (68-Y 29-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB439H1 |
2020-03-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20108106D-H1 |
2020-03-04 | House | Read third time |
2020-03-03 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-28 | House | Committee substitute printed 20108106D-H1 |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 5-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2020-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB439S2 |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20107752D-S2 |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Committee substitute rejected 20106514D-S1 |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20107752D-S2 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20106514D-S1 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Incorporates SB520 (McDougle) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Incorporates SB154 (Stuart) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Assigned Judiciary sub: Criminal Law |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Moved from Courts of Justice to Judiciary due to a change of the committee name |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100957D |
Same As/Similar To
SB154 (Similar To) 2020-01-29 - Incorporated by Judiciary
SB520 (Similar To) 2020-01-29 - Incorporated by Judiciary
SB520 (Similar To) 2020-01-29 - Incorporated by Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 270.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 271.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |