VA SB437 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1259)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Bicyclists and other vulnerable road users; penalty. Provides that a person who operates a motor vehicle in a careless or distracted manner and is the proximate cause of serious physical injury to a vulnerable road user, defined in the bill as a pedestrian; the operator of or passenger on a bicycle, electric personal assistive mobility device, electric power-assisted bicycle, wheel chair or wheel chair conveyance, skateboard, roller skates, motorized skateboard or scooter, or animal-drawn vehicle or any attached device; or any person riding an animal, is guilty of a Class 1 misdemeanor. The bill also prohibits the driver of a motor vehicle from crossing into a bicycle lane to pass or attempt to pass another vehicle, except in certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bicyclists and other vulnerable road users; penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-22 - House - House: VOTE: (56-Y 36-N) (Y: 56 N: 35 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (26-Y 14-N) (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (63-Y 37-N) (Y: 63 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (25-Y 15-N) (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-22 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1259)
2020-04-22HouseEnacted, Chapter 1259 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-04-22HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2020-04-22SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2020-04-22SenateReenrolled bill text (SB437ER2)
2020-04-22SenateReenrolled
2020-04-22 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2020-04-22HouseVOTE: (56-Y 36-N)
2020-04-22HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (56-Y 36-N)
2020-04-22SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 1-N)
2020-04-11SenateGovernor's recommendation received by Senate
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-05HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-05SenateSigned by President
2020-03-04SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB437ER)
2020-03-04SenateEnrolled
2020-02-27SenateHouse amendment agreed to by Senate (26-Y 14-N)
2020-02-27SenatePassed by temporarily
2020-02-25HouseVOTE: Passage (63-Y 37-N)
2020-02-25HousePassed House with amendment (63-Y 37-N)
2020-02-25HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2020-02-25HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2020-02-25HouseRead third time
2020-02-24HouseRead second time
2020-02-20HouseReported from Transportation with amendment (15-Y 6-N)
2020-02-17HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 1-N)
2020-02-13HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Motor Vehicles
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2020-02-13HouseRead first time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-01-22SenateRead third time and passed Senate (25-Y 15-N)
2020-01-21SenateRead second time and engrossed
2020-01-20SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-01-16SenateReported from Transportation (10-Y 5-N)
2020-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2020-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100562D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
462816.1(n/a)See Bill Text
462841(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB437&201+sum+SB437
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB437+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB437ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB437ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP1259+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S11V0010+SB0437
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0078SB0437+SB0437
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0118SB0437+SB0437
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1902V0051+SB0437
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H19V0146+SB0437
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1354+SB0437
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1155SB0437+SB0437
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1954SB0437+SB0437
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV2254+SB0437

Bill Comments

feedback