VA SB436 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0575)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0575)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Sex crimes; penalties. Imposes a mandatory minimum life sentence for rape, forcible sodomy, or object sexual penetration of a child under the age of 13 when it is alleged in the indictment that the offender was 18 years of age or older at the time of the offense.
Title
Sex crimes; penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (33-Y 7-N) (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (81-Y 14-N) (Y: 83 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (2-Y 38-N) (Y: 2 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (70-Y 24-N) (Y: 72 N: 24 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 3-N) (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 2-N) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (81-Y 14-N) (Y: 83 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (2-Y 38-N) (Y: 2 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (70-Y 24-N) (Y: 72 N: 24 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 3-N) (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 2-N) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0575) | |
2012-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 575 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-17 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-15 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-15 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB436ER) | |
2012-03-15 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2012-03-10 | Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (33-Y 7-N) | |
2012-03-10 | Senate: Conference substitute printed 12106046D-S3 | |
2012-03-10 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (81-Y 14-N) | |
2012-03-10 | House: Conference report agreed to by House (81-Y 14-N) | |
2012-03-08 | House: Delegates: Bell, Robert B, Albo, Spruill | |
2012-03-08 | House: Conferees appointed by House | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Senators: Obenshain, Garrett, Reeves | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Conferees appointed by Senate | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-07 | House: House requested conference committee | |
2012-03-07 | House: House insisted on substitute | |
2012-03-06 | Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (2-Y 38-N) | |
2012-03-05 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (70-Y 24-N) | |
2012-03-05 | House: Passed House with substitute (70-Y 24-N) | |
2012-03-05 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB436H1 | |
2012-03-05 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 12105658D-H1 | |
2012-03-05 | House: Read third time | |
2012-03-02 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-29 | House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-29 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-28 | House: Assigned App. sub: Public Safety | |
2012-02-27 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-02-27 | House: Committee substitute printed 12105658D-H1 | |
2012-02-27 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 3-N) | |
2012-02-27 | House: Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-02-27 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 2-N) | |
2012-02-17 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal | |
2012-02-17 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-02-17 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-17 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-10 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 13-N) | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB436S2 | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 12105073D-S2 | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Committee substitute rejected 12104528D-S1 | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-02-08 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-07 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12105073D-S2 | |
2012-02-07 | Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 1-N) | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12104528D-S1 | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (8-Y 7-N) | |
2012-01-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-01-11 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103707D |
Same As/Similar To
HB973 (Same As) 2012-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0605)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 61 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 67.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 67.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 67.5:3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |