VA SB435 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 17 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-20 - Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Waterfowl blinds in locality where certain hunting prohibited. Directs the Department of Game and Inland Fisheries not to license any stationary waterfowl blind in any area in which a local governing body prohibits by ordinance the hunting of birds with a firearm.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Waterfowl blinds; blinds in locality where certain hunting prohibited.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-20SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-01-17SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB435S1
2020-01-17SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20105779D-S1
2020-01-17SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-01-17SenateRead second time
2020-01-16SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-01-14SenateCommittee substitute printed 20105779D-S1
2020-01-14SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (14-Y 0-N)
2020-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2020-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101208D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
291342.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback