VA SB426 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0652)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0652)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Victims of domestic violence; list of local resources. Provides that upon issuance of an emergency, preliminary, or permanent protective order, the clerk of the court shall make available to the petitioner information that is published by the Department of Criminal Justice Services for victims of domestic violence or for petitioners in protective order cases.
Title
Victims of domestic violence; clerk of court shall make certain information available to petitioner.
Sponsors
Sen. Jennifer Wexton [D] | Sen. Amanda Chase [R] | Sen. Siobhan Dunnavant [R] | Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] |
Sen. Jennifer McClellan [D] | Sen. Jill Vogel [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0652) | |
2018-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 652 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 20, 2018 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB426ER) |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-08 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-07 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-07 | House | Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-07 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2018-03-07 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2018-03-07 | House | Read third time |
2018-03-06 | House | Read second time |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-22 | House | Assigned App. sub: Public Safety |
2018-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-15 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB426S2 |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18106889D-S2 |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute rejected 18105468D-S1 |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18106889D-S2 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18105468D-S1 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101000D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 253.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 253.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 279.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 152.10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 152.8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 152.9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |