VA SB425 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-31 - Stricken at request of Patron in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-31 - Stricken at request of Patron in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Assisted living facilities; audio-visual recording of residents. Directs the Board of Social Services (the Board) to promulgate regulations by July 1, 2021, governing audio-visual recording of residents in assisted living facilities and requires the Department of Social Services to convene a work group of stakeholders to make recommendations on such regulations. The work group shall report its recommendations to the Board and the General Assembly by December 1, 2020.
Title
Assisted living facilities; audio-visual recording of residents, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Stricken at request of Patron in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-31 | Senate | Stricken at request of Patron in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102643D |