VA SB422 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-27 - Senate sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-27 - Senate sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Health insurance; tobacco surcharge. Eliminates the authority of a health carrier to vary its premium rates based on tobacco use. Under current law, a health carrier may charge premium rates up to 1.5 times higher for a tobacco user than for a nonuser. This bill is a recommendation of the Joint Commission on Health Care, and the provisions of the bill shall apply to health benefit plans providing individual or small group health insurance coverage beginning on January 1, 2023.
Title
Health insurance; tobacco surcharge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Motion to pass in enrolled form rejected (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (61-Y 37-N) (Y: 61 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (10-Y 4-N 1-A) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (61-Y 37-N) (Y: 61 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (10-Y 4-N 1-A) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate sustained Governor's veto |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Requires 2/3 affirmative votes to pass in enrolled form |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Motion to pass in enrolled form rejected (21-Y 19-N) |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB422ER) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-08 | House | VOTE: Passage (61-Y 37-N) |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed House (61-Y 37-N) |
2022-03-08 | House | Read third time |
2022-03-07 | House | Read second time |
2022-03-03 | House | Reported from Commerce and Energy (19-Y 3-N) |
2022-02-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy |
2022-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 1-N) |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 22103427D-E |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB422E |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (10-Y 4-N 1-A) |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103427D |