VA SB422 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0204)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0204)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Foreclosure; notice of sale when owner is deceased. Provides that when the owner of a property to be sold by a trustee pursuant to a deed of trust is deceased, the notice of the sale shall be delivered to the last known address of the deceased owner, any personal representative of the deceased's estate, and any heirs of the deceased as recorded in the land records where the property is located. The bill further provides that the trustee of a deed of trust for property that is sold after the death of the owner shall include (i) any remaining subsequent debts and obligations secured by the deed and (ii) any liens of record inferior to the deed of trust under which the sale is made, with lawful interest, in the list of debts to be paid off using any surplus from the sale prior to paying the remainder of the surplus to the decedent's personal representative. This bill is identical to HB 755.
Title
Foreclosure; notice of sale when owner is deceased.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0204) | |
2018-03-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 204 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 5, 2018 | |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 26, 2018 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB422ER) |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-02-19 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-19 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-19 | House | Read third time |
2018-02-16 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-14 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB422S1 |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18106004D-S1 |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18106004D-S1 |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102237D |