VA SB420 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB420

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Public schools; seizure management and action plans; training. Provides for the submission and utilization of seizure management and action plans for students with a seizure disorder. The bill requires that school nurses and certain school division employees biennially complete a Board of Education-approved online course of instruction regarding treating students with seizure disorders. The bill also provides immunity from civil liability for acts or omissions related to providing for the care of a student under a seizure management and action plan. Public schools; seizure management and action plans; training. Provides for the submission and utilization of seizure management and action plans for students with a seizure disorder. The bill requires that school nurses and certain school division employees biennially complete a Board of Education-approved online course of instruction regarding treating students with seizure disorders. The bill also provides immunity from civil liability for acts or omissions related to providing for the care of a student under a seizure management and action plan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public schools; seizure management and action plan, training.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (12-Y 1-N 2-A) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-04HouseLeft in Education
2020-02-24HouseContinued to 2021 in Education by voice vote
2020-02-24HouseSubcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote
2020-02-18HouseAssigned Education sub: SOL and SOQ
2020-02-18HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2020-02-18HouseReferred from Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2020-02-13HouseRead first time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-04SenateRead third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N)
2020-02-03SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB420S1
2020-02-03SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20106140D-S1
2020-02-03SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-03SenateRead second time
2020-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2020-01-30SenateCommittee substitute printed 20106140D-S1
2020-01-30SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (12-Y 1-N 2-A)
2020-01-20SenateAssigned Education sub: Public Education
2020-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2020-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101767D

Same As/Similar To

SB420 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Continued to 2021 in Education by voice vote

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221274.5(n/a)See Bill Text
801225(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback