VA SB420 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0699)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0699)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Witness testimony accompanied by certified facility dogs. Provides that in any criminal proceeding the attorney for the Commonwealth or the defendant may request and the court may enter an order authorizing the use of a certified facility dog to aid a testifying witness, provided that the use of a certified facility dog will aid the witness in providing testimony and the presence and use of the certified facility dog will not interfere with or distract from the testimony or proceedings. The bill provides that the court may make any orders necessary to preserve the fairness of the proceeding, including imposing restrictions on and instructing the jury regarding the presence of the certified facility dog. The bill defines "certified facility dog" as a dog that (i) has completed training and been certified by a program accredited by Assistance Dogs International or another organization whose main purpose is to improve training, placement, and utilization of assistance dogs and (ii) is accompanied by a duly trained handler. This bill is identical to HB 482.
Title
Witness testimony; accompanied by certified facility dogs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (31-Y 7-N) (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (30-Y 10-N) (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (30-Y 10-N) (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0699) | |
2018-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 699 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-15 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 15, 2018 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB420ER) |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Title replaced 18107299D-H1 |
2018-03-02 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (31-Y 7-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB420H1 |
2018-02-28 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 18107299D-H1 |
2018-02-28 | House | Read third time |
2018-02-27 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-23 | House | Committee substitute printed 18107299D-H1 |
2018-02-23 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-15 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-29 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (30-Y 10-N) |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB420S1 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18104871D-S1 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18104871D-S1 |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (10-Y 4-N) |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101337D |