VA SB420 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0465)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0465)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Urban development areas. Sets certain densities in urban development areas according to the population of the locality that designated the urban development area. The bill also requires that, to the extent possible, certain federal funding and state water and sewer facility and public infrastructure funding be directed to urban development areas or other designated growth areas. The bill mandates that the Commission on Local Government report on localities' compliance with the statute requiring the designation of urban development areas.
Title
Urban development; sets certain densities in areas according to population of locality.
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Vogel [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-04 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0465) | |
2010-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 465 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-12 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-11 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB420ER) | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-03-04 | Senate: Title replaced 10105637D-H1 | |
2010-03-04 | Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-02 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-02 | House: Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-02 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB420H1 | |
2010-03-02 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 10105637D-H1 | |
2010-03-02 | House: Read third time | |
2010-03-01 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-26 | House: Committee substitute printed 10105637D-H1 | |
2010-02-26 | House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-25 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-22 | House: Assigned CC & T sub: #2 | |
2010-02-17 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2010-02-17 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-17 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB420S2 | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Substitute by Senator Vogel agreed to 10105412D-S2 | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Floor substitute printed 10105412D-S2 (Vogel) | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Committee substitute rejected 10105194D-S1 | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-02-12 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2010-02-12 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-09 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 10105194D-S1 | |
2010-02-09 | Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (14-Y 1-N) | |
2010-01-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2010-01-13 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103955D |