VA SB42 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 7 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Aggravated sexual battery; penalty. Provides that any massage therapist, person practicing the healing arts, or physical therapist, or a person purporting to be such practitioner, who sexually abuses another person without the express consent of the complaining witness is guilty of aggravated sexual battery.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Aggravated sexual battery; penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (84-Y 12-N) (Y: 83 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 3-N) (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-08HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-07SenateSigned by President
2020-03-07SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB42ER)
2020-03-07SenateEnrolled
2020-03-04HouseVOTE: Passage (84-Y 12-N)
2020-03-04HousePassed House (84-Y 12-N)
2020-03-04HouseRead third time
2020-03-03HouseRead second time
2020-02-28HouseReported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 3-N)
2020-02-24HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N)
2020-02-18HouseAssigned Courts sub: Criminal
2020-02-12HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-02-12HouseRead first time
2020-02-12HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-07SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-07SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-07SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB42S1
2020-02-07SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20106403D-S1
2020-02-07SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-07SenateRead second time
2020-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-05SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
2020-01-29SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-01-29SenateCommittee substitute printed 20106403D-S1
2020-01-29SenateReported from Judiciary with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
2020-01-16SenateAssigned Judiciary sub: Criminal Law
2020-01-08SenateMoved from Courts of Justice to Judiciary due to a change of the committee name
2019-11-18SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2019-11-18SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100063D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
18267.3(n/a)See Bill Text
18267.4(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB42&201+sum+SB42
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB42+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB42S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB42ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S03V0110+SB0042
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0161+SB0042
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0382SB0042+SB0042
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0403SB0042+SB0042
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0404SB0042+SB0042
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0801V0196+SB0042
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H08V0414+SB0042
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1854+SB0042

Bill Comments

feedback