VA SB414 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-05 - Continued to 2019 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-05 - Continued to 2019 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Micro Market Act; penalty. Provides for the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services to issue permits for the operation of a micro market, which is defined in the bill as an unattended, self-checkout retail food establishment located in the interior of a building that is accessible to a defined population, such as the employees of a particular employer or occupants of the building in which the micro market is located, and is not accessible to the general public. The bill establishes minimum standards for the operation of a micro market and provides that any person who operates a micro market without the required permit or violates a condition of such permit is guilty of a Class 1 misdemeanor.
Title
Micro Market Act; registration required for operation of micro markets, effective clause.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2019 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Pursuant to rule 20g |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Recommitted to Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Motion to recommit to committee agreed to |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB414S1 |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18105899D-S1 |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 1-N) |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18105899D-S1 |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104431D |