VA SB41 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Incorporated by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Incorporated by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Larceny of a catalytic converter; penalty. Provides that any person who conspires, confederates, or combines with another to commit larceny or counsels, assists, aids, or abets another in the performance of a larceny of a catalytic converter from a motor vehicle where the value of such catalytic converter is less than $1,000 is guilty of a Class 1 misdemeanor.
Title
Larceny of a catalytic converter; penalty.
Sponsors
Sen. Lionell Spruill [D] | Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D] | Sen. Amanda Chase [R] | Sen. John Cosgrove [R] |
Sen. Louise Lucas [D] | Sen. Richard Saslaw [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Incorporated by Judiciary (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Senate | Incorporated by Judiciary |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Assigned Judiciary sub: Criminal Law |
2021-12-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2021-12-27 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100674D |
Same As/Similar To
SB729 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0665)
SB729 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0665)
SB729 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0665)