VA SB408 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0339)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0339)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Transmission of sentencing documents to the Department of Health Professions and Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services. Provides that after the pronouncement of sentence, if the court is aware that the defendant is registered, certified, or licensed by a health regulatory board or holds a multistate licensure privilege, or is licensed by the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services, and the defendant has been convicted of a felony, crime involving moral turpitude, or crime that occurred during the course of practice for which such practitioner or person is licensed, the court shall order the clerk of the court to transmit certified copies of sentencing documents to the Director of the Department of Health Professions or to the Commissioner of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services. Transmission of sentencing documents to the Department of Health Professions and Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services. Provides that after the pronouncement of sentence, if the court is aware that the defendant is registered, certified, or licensed by a health regulatory board or holds a multistate licensure privilege, or is licensed by the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services, and the defendant has been convicted of a felony, crime involving moral turpitude, or crime that occurred during the course of practice for which such practitioner or person is licensed, the court shall order the clerk of the court to transmit certified copies of sentencing documents to the Director of the Department of Health Professions or to the Commissioner of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services.
Title
Sentencing documents; transmission to the DHP and DBHDS.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0339) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 339 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB408ER) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-03 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-01 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-01 | House | Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-01 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2022-03-01 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2022-03-01 | House | Read third time |
2022-02-28 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-25 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (20-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-22 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB408S1 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22105762D-S1 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22105762D-S1 |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101439D |