VA SB407 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0541)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0541)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Government Data Collection and Dissemination Practices Act; exemption for the Division of Capitol Police. Exempts personal information systems maintained by the Division of Capitol Police that deal with investigations and intelligence gathering relating to criminal activity from the Government Data Collection and Dissemination Practices Act (?§2.2-3800 et seq.).
Title
Government Data Collection & Dissemination Practices Act; exemption for Division of Capitol Police.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0541) | |
2018-03-29 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 541 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-16 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 16, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB407ER) |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-06 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | Read third time |
2018-03-05 | House | Read second time |
2018-03-01 | House | Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-02-19 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-19 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100667D |