VA SB405 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0844)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Zoning for wireless communications infrastructure. Establishes parameters regarding applications for zoning approvals for certain wireless support structures. Applications for certain new wireless support structures that are 50 feet or less above ground level and for the co-location on an existing structure of a wireless facility that is not a small cell facility are exempt from requirements that they obtain a special exception, special use permit, or variance, though a locality may require administrative review for the issuance of any zoning permits or an acknowledgement that zoning approval is not required for such projects. Aspects of the zoning approval process addressed in this measure include periods for approval or disapproval of applications; a requirement that applications are deemed approved if not approved or disapproved within the applicable period; application fees; a prohibition against unreasonably discriminating between applicants and other wireless services providers, providers of telecommunications services, and other providers of functionally-equivalent service; and limits on the number of new wireless support structures that can be installed in a specific location. The measure prohibits a locality, in its receiving, consideration, and processing of an application for zoning approval, from engaging in certain activities. The measure states that it does not prohibit a locality from disapproving an application submitted under a standard process project on the basis of the availability of existing wireless support structures within a reasonable distance that could be used for co-location at reasonable terms and conditions without imposing technical limitations on the applicant. The measure also requires that any publicly owned or privately owned wireless service provider operating within the Commonwealth or serving residents of the Commonwealth shall, by January 1, 2019, and annually thereafter until January 1, 2025, provide to the Department of Housing and Community Development a report detailing, by county, city, or town, enhanced service capacity in previously served areas and expansion of service in previously unserved geographic areas that are provided access to wireless service. The measure also directs the Secretariats of Commerce and Trade and Public Safety and Homeland Security to convene a group of stakeholders to develop a plan for expanding access to wireless services in unserved and underserved areas of the Commonwealth. This bill is identical to HB 1258.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wireless communications infrastructure; zoning.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 6-N 1-A) (Y: 90 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (36-Y 0-N 3-A) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (20-Y 16-N 4-A) (Y: 20 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (25-Y 11-N 4-A) (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (49-Y 48-N 2-A) (Y: 49 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 13-N 4-A) (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0844)
2018-04-18HouseEnacted, Chapter 844 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-04-18HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2018-04-18SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2018-04-18SenateReenrolled bill text (SB405ER2)
2018-04-18SenateReenrolled
2018-04-18 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2018-04-18HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 6-N 1-A)
2018-04-18HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (90-Y 6-N 1-A)
2018-04-18SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (36-Y 0-N 3-A)
2018-04-09SenateGovernor's recommendation received by Senate
2018-03-16 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-16SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 16, 2018
2018-03-10SenateSigned by President
2018-03-08HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-08SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB405ER)
2018-03-08SenateEnrolled
2018-03-06SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (20-Y 16-N 4-A)
2018-03-06SenateReconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-03-06SenateTitle replaced 18107475D-H1
2018-03-06SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (25-Y 11-N 4-A)
2018-03-05HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (49-Y 48-N 2-A)
2018-03-05HousePassed House with substitute (49-Y 48-N 2-A)
2018-03-05HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB405H1
2018-03-05HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 18107475D-H1
2018-03-05HouseRead third time
2018-03-02HousePassed by for the day
2018-03-01HouseRead second time
2018-02-27HouseCommittee substitute printed 18107475D-H1
2018-02-27HouseReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (16-Y 5-N)
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2018-02-14HouseRead first time
2018-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-09SenateRead third time and passed Senate (22-Y 13-N 4-A)
2018-02-08SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB405S1
2018-02-08SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 18106360D-S1
2018-02-08SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-02-08SenateRead second time
2018-02-07SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2018-02-05SenateCommittee substitute printed 18106360D-S1
2018-02-05SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 0-N 2-A)
2018-01-10SenateIntroduced bill reprinted 18101342D
2018-01-10SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2018-01-10SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101342D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1522316.3(n/a)See Bill Text
1522316.4:1(n/a)See Bill Text
1522316.4:2(n/a)See Bill Text
1522316.4:3(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.1:01(n/a)See Bill Text
5414201.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+SB405
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB405+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB405S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB405H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB405ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB405ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0844+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S02V0082+SB0405
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0351SB0405+SB0405
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0383SB0405+SB0405
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H14V0201+SB0405
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1269+SB0405
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0953SB0405+SB0405
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0955SB0405+SB0405
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0957SB0405+SB0405
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1231SB0405+SB0405
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1669+SB0405

Bill Comments

feedback