VA SB404 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0351)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0351)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
HOV lanes; clean special fuel vehicles; government use. Removes requirement that the Commissioner provide written regulations before the Department of Motor Vehicles may issue government-use license plates for clean special fuel vehicles.
Title
Clean special fuel vehicles; removes requirement that Commissioner provide written regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-04 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0351) | |
2010-04-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 351 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-12 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-11 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB404ER) | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-03-04 | Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-02 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-02 | House: Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-02 | House: Engrossed by House as amended | |
2010-03-02 | House: Read third time | |
2010-03-01 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2010-03-01 | House: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2010-03-01 | House: Read third time | |
2010-02-26 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-25 | House: Reported from Transportation with amendments (21-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2010-02-16 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-16 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-10 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-09 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB404S1 | |
2010-02-09 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 10104771D-S1 | |
2010-02-09 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-02-09 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-02-08 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-04 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 10104771D-S1 | |
2010-02-04 | Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (14-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2010-01-13 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103600D |