VA SB402 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Driving under the influence; secure transdermal alcohol monitoring. Provides that the court may, upon request of an offender convicted for DUI who has not been previously prohibited from operating a vehicle that is not equipped with a functioning ignition interlock system, order that the offender (i) wear a secure transdermal alcohol-monitoring device that continuously monitors the person's blood alcohol level and (ii) refrain from alcohol consumption. The bill provides that if an offender is ordered to wear such a device, the only conditions that will be imposed upon the offender's restricted driver's license, if one is issued, shall be the wearing of such a device and the existing requirement to have an ignition interlock system. The bill also provides that it is a Class 1 misdemeanor to tamper with or in any way attempt to circumvent the operation of a secure transdermal alcohol-monitoring device.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Driving under influence of alcohol; secure transdermal alcohol monitoring.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-06HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2018-02-28HouseSubcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (7-Y 1-N)
2018-02-27HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-02-15HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-02-15HouseRead first time
2018-02-15HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-12SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-09SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB402S2
2018-02-09SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 18106783D-S2
2018-02-09SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-02-09SenateCommittee substitute rejected 18104972D-S1
2018-02-09SenateRead second time
2018-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-07SenateCommittee substitute printed 18106783D-S2
2018-02-07SenateReported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
2018-01-22SenateRereferred to Finance
2018-01-22SenateCommittee substitute printed 18104972D-S1
2018-01-22SenateReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
2018-01-09SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-01-09SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100330D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182270.1(n/a)See Bill Text
182270.2(n/a)See Bill Text
182271.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback