VA SB401 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0721)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0721)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Enforcement of gaming laws; Gaming Enforcement Coordinator established. Establishes the Office of the Gaming Enforcement Coordinator in the Department of State Police and charges such Coordinator with coordinating local, state, and federal enforcement of gaming laws, defined as laws regulating gambling, charitable gaming, lottery games, sports betting, casino gaming, fantasy contests, and horse racing and pari-mutuel wagering, and with establishing a tip line for members of the public to report concerns about gaming activities.
Title
Gaming laws; enforcement, definitions, Gaming Enforcement Coordinator established.
Sponsors
Sen. John Bell [D] | Sen. Bryce Reeves [R] | Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (72-Y 28-N) (Y: 72 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (37-Y 0-N 3-A) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N 3-A) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (76-Y 22-N) (Y: 76 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 1-N 3-A) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (37-Y 0-N 3-A) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N 3-A) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (76-Y 22-N) (Y: 76 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 1-N 3-A) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0721) | |
2022-04-27 | House | Enacted, Chapter 721 (effective 7/1/22) |
2022-04-27 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Reenrolled bill text (SB401ER2) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Reenrolled |
2022-04-27 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2022-04-27 | House | VOTE: Adoption (72-Y 28-N) |
2022-04-27 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (72-Y 28-N) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (37-Y 0-N 3-A) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Governor's substitute printed 22108188D-S2 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB401ER) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Title replaced 22107110D-H1 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N 3-A) |
2022-03-01 | House | VOTE: Passage (76-Y 22-N) |
2022-03-01 | House | Passed House with substitute (76-Y 22-N) |
2022-03-01 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB401H1 |
2022-03-01 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22107110D-H1 |
2022-03-01 | House | Read third time |
2022-02-28 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-24 | House | Committee substitute printed 22107110D-H1 |
2022-02-24 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 1-N) |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (36-Y 1-N 3-A) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB401S1 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22105797D-S1 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22105797D-S1 |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Assigned GL&T sub: Gaming |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102802D |
Same As/Similar To
HB766 (Same As) 2022-04-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0768)
HB766 (Same As) 2022-04-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0768)
HB766 (Same As) 2022-04-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0768)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 340.16 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 340.35:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4002 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4005.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |