VA SB399 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0555)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0555)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charitable gaming; violations; civil penalty. Provides for a civil penalty of not less than $25,000 and not more than $50,000 for any person or organization, whether permitted or qualified pursuant to applicable charitable gaming laws or not, that (i) conducts charitable gaming without first obtaining a permit to do so, (ii) continues to conduct such games after revocation or suspension of such permit, or (iii) otherwise violates any charitable gaming provisions. The bill provides that any such civil penalties collected shall be payable to the State Treasurer for remittance to the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services.
Title
Charitable gaming; conducting without a permit, civil penalty.
Sponsors
Sen. John Bell [D] | Sen. Bryce Reeves [R] | Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N 3-A) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (70-Y 29-N) (Y: 70 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 1-N 3-A) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (70-Y 29-N) (Y: 70 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 1-N 3-A) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0555) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 555 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB399ER) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Title replaced 22107109D-H1 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N 3-A) |
2022-03-01 | House | VOTE: Passage (70-Y 29-N) |
2022-03-01 | House | Passed House with substitute (70-Y 29-N) |
2022-03-01 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB399H1 |
2022-03-01 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22107109D-H1 |
2022-03-01 | House | Read third time |
2022-02-28 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-24 | House | Committee substitute printed 22107109D-H1 |
2022-02-24 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (19-Y 3-N) |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (36-Y 1-N 3-A) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Rereferred to General Laws and Technology |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Rereferred from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102789D |
Same As/Similar To
HB767 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0608)
HB767 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0608)
HB767 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0608)