VA SB399 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0600)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0600)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local or regional overdose fatality review teams. Authorizes any county or city, or any combination of counties, cities, or counties and cities, to establish a local or regional overdose fatality review team for the purpose of (i) conducting contemporaneous reviews of local overdose deaths, (ii) promoting cooperation and coordination among agencies involved in investigations of overdose deaths or in providing services to surviving family members, (iii) developing an understanding of the causes and incidence of overdose deaths in the locality, (iv) developing plans for and recommending changes within the agencies represented on the local team to prevent overdose deaths, and (v) advising the Department of Health and other relevant state agencies on changes to law, policy, or practice to prevent overdose deaths. The bill authorizes a local or regional team to review the death of any person who resides in the Commonwealth and whose death was or is suspected to be due to overdose. A violation of the confidentiality of the review process is punishable as a Class 3 misdemeanor.
Title
Drug overdose fatality review teams, local or regional; localities to establish.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0600) | |
2018-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 600 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-05 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 5, 2018 |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB399ER) |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-02-23 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-23 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-23 | House | Read third time |
2018-02-22 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-20 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB399S1 |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18106095D-S1 |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 2-N) |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18106095D-S1 |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101721D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 3705.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3711 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 283.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |