VA SB399 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0302)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0302)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Sharing of information of a member of the Virginia National Guard with the Virginia Employment Commission. Requires the Adjutant General of the Virginia National Guard to establish a program under which the Department of Military Affairs shall, upon request of a member of the Virginia National Guard, provide information on the member to the Virginia Employment Commission.
Title
Virginia National Guard; DMA shall provide information to VEC upon request of a member.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0302) | |
2014-03-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 302 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB399ER) |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-02-27 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-25 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-25 | House | Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-25 | House | Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House |
2014-02-25 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-25 | House | Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-25 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2014-02-25 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2014-02-25 | House | Read third time |
2014-02-24 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-21 | House | Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-14 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2014-01-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2014-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 14102338D-E |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB399E |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (12-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102338D |
Same As/Similar To
HB971 (Same As) 2014-02-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0042)
Subjects
Armed Forces
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Labor and Employment
Military and Emergency Laws
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Labor and Employment
Military and Emergency Laws