VA SB397 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0932)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0932)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Health; work group; nursing home workforce. Directs the Department of Health to convene a work group to review and make recommendations on increasing the availability of the clinical workforce for nursing homes in the Commonwealth. The work group shall include stakeholder groups as appropriate. The bill directs the Department to collaborate with the Department of Health Professions, the Governor's Chief Workforce Development Advisor, and other state agencies as appropriate. The bill directs the Department to report all recommendations to the Chairmen of the Senate Committee on Education and Health and the House Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions on or before November 15, 2020.
Title
Nursing homes; VDH to convene work group related to increasing availability of clinical workforce.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0932) | |
2020-04-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 932 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB397ER) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-28 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-28 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-28 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-27 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-25 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-13 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Health |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB397S1 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20107146D-S1 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20107146D-S1 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104781D |