VA SB394 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0628)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Health Club Act; automated external defibrillator required in health clubs. Requires each health club location to have a working automated external defibrillator.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Health Club Act; automated external defibrillator required in health clubs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-02 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0628)
2020-04-02 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 628 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-03SenateSigned by President
2020-03-02HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-02SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB394ER)
2020-03-02SenateEnrolled
2020-02-25HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2020-02-25HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2020-02-25HouseRead third time
2020-02-24HouseRead second time
2020-02-20HouseReported from Labor and Commerce (21-Y 0-N)
2020-02-18HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N)
2020-02-14HouseAssigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #1
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2020-02-13HouseRead first time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-01-24SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-01-23SenateRead second time and engrossed
2020-01-22SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-01-20SenateReported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
2020-01-06SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2020-01-06SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101164D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
591296(n/a)See Bill Text
591296.2:2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback