VA SB394 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0628)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0628)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Health Club Act; automated external defibrillator required in health clubs. Requires each health club location to have a working automated external defibrillator.
Title
Virginia Health Club Act; automated external defibrillator required in health clubs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0628) | |
2020-04-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 628 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB394ER) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-25 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-25 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-25 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-24 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-20 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce (21-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-14 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101164D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 1 | 296 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 296.2:2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |