VA SB394 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0755)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0755)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Office of the Qualified Education Loan Ombudsman. Establishes the Office of the Qualified Education Loan Ombudsman (the Office) within the State Council of Higher Education for Virginia. The Office's duties include (i) receiving, reviewing, and attempting to resolve complaints from qualified education loan borrowers; (ii) compiling and analyzing data on such complaints; (iii) assisting qualified education loan borrowers to understand their rights and responsibilities under the terms of qualified education loans; (iv) providing information regarding the problems and concerns of qualified education loan borrowers; (v) analyzing and monitoring the development and implementation of applicable laws and policies; and (vi) disseminating information concerning the availability of the Office to assist qualified education loan borrowers and any other participant in qualified education loan lending with qualified education loan servicing concerns. The Office is further required to establish and maintain a qualified education loan borrower education course by December 1, 2019. This bill is identical to HB 1138.
Title
Qualified Education Loan Ombudsman, Office of the; established, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 8-N) (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 8-N) (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0755) | |
2018-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 755 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-14 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 14, 2018 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB394ER) |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-02-28 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2018-02-26 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 8-N) |
2018-02-26 | House | Passed House with amendment (90-Y 8-N) |
2018-02-26 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2018-02-26 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2018-02-26 | House | Read third time |
2018-02-23 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-21 | House | Reported from Education with amendment (20-Y 2-N) |
2018-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2018-02-15 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 18106492D-ES1 |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB394ES1 |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18106492D-S1 |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Incorporates SB439 (Wexton) |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18106492D-S1 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 2-N) |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104609D |