VA SB392 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0884)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0884)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local school boards; lead testing; report; parental notification. Requires each local school board's plan to test and remediate certain potable water sources to be consistent with guidance published by the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency or the Department of Health. The bill requires each local school board to submit such testing plan and report the results of any such test to the Department of Health. The bill also requires local school boards to take all steps necessary to notify parents if testing results indicate lead contamination that exceeds 10 parts per billion.
Title
Local school boards; lead testing, report, parental notification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (94-Y 1-N) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: House amendments rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: House amendments rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0884) | |
2020-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 884 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020 |
2020-03-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB392ER) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-03-08 | House | VOTE: Adoption (94-Y 1-N) |
2020-03-08 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (94-Y 1-N) |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-07 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2020-03-05 | House | Delegates: Askew, Subramanyam, Davis |
2020-03-05 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senators: McPike, Lewis, Cosgrove |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (39-Y 1-N) |
2020-03-05 | House | House requested conference committee |
2020-03-05 | House | House insisted on amendments |
2020-03-05 | Senate | House amendments rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2020-03-04 | House | Committee on Appropriations amendment agreed to |
2020-03-04 | House | Committee on Education amendment agreed to |
2020-03-04 | House | Read third time |
2020-03-03 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2020-02-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-24 | House | Reported from Education with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned Education sub: SOL and SOQ |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-02-18 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB392S1 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20106397D-S1 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20106397D-S1 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101168D |
Same As/Similar To
HB797 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0293)