VA SB391 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0931)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Adult abuse; financial exploitation; required report by financial institution. Requires financial institutions to report to the local department of social services or the adult protective services hotline within five business days any refusal to execute a transaction, delay of a transaction, or refusal to disburse funds based on a good faith belief that such transaction or disbursement may involve financial exploitation of an adult.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adult abuse; financial exploitation, required report by financial institution.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (7-Y 6-N 1-A) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-09 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0931)
2020-04-09 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 931 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-07SenateSigned by President
2020-03-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-05SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB391ER)
2020-03-05SenateEnrolled
2020-02-28HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2020-02-28HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2020-02-28HouseRead third time
2020-02-27HouseRead second time
2020-02-25HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
2020-02-20HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N)
2020-02-13HouseAssigned HWI sub: Social Services
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2020-02-13HouseRead first time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-01-31SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-01-30SenateEngrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB391S1
2020-01-30SenateSubstitute by Senator Favola agreed to 20107209D-S1
2020-01-30SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-01-30SenateEngrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-01-30SenateFloor substitute printed 20107209D-S1 (Favola)
2020-01-29SenatePassed by for the day
2020-01-28SenatePassed by for the day
2020-01-27SenatePassed by for the day
2020-01-24SenatePassed by for the day
2020-01-23SenatePassed by for the day
2020-01-22SenatePassed by for the day
2020-01-21SenateMotion to rerefer to committee rejected
2020-01-21SenateRead second time and engrossed
2020-01-20SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-01-17SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (7-Y 6-N 1-A)
2020-01-06SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2020-01-06SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101169D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6321606(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB391&201+sum+SB391
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB391+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB391S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB391ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP0931+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S09V0028+SB0391
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0078SB0391+SB0391
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0237SB0391+SB0391
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0250SB0391+SB0391
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1204V0035+SB0391
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H12V0402+SB0391
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H12V0449+SB0391
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1627+SB0391

Bill Comments

feedback