VA SB388 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0306)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0306)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Life, Accident and Sickness Insurance Guaranty Association; board of directors. Increases the minimum number of members of the board of directors of the Virginia Life, Accident and Sickness Insurance Guaranty Association from five to nine and the maximum number of such members from nine to 13. This bill is identical to HB 451.
Title
Virginia Life, Accident and Sickness Insurance Guaranty Association; board of directors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0306) | |
2018-03-19 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 306 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-05 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 5, 2018 |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB388ER) |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-02-23 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-23 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-23 | House | Read third time |
2018-02-22 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-20 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-02-15 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102082D |