VA SB387 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB387

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Charitable gaming; special permit for the play of electronic versions of instant bingo, pull tabs, or seal cards on certain premises. Creates a special permit that shall be granted to a qualified organization that has already received a general permit for the conduct of charitable gaming from the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services to allow such organization to place Department-approved electronic versions of instant bingo, pull tabs, or seal cards on the licensed premises of an entity licensed to sell alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption with the consent of such licensee. The bill also exempts qualified organizations that are granted such special permit from certain requirements relating to (i) limits on the number of organizations for which a person may manage, operate, or conduct charitable games; (ii) prohibitions on providing compensation or any other remuneration to persons for organizing, managing, or conducting charitable games; or (iii) the use of proceeds derived from the conduct of charitable games, as those requirements relate to the management, operation, or conduct of charitable games pursuant to such special permit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Charitable gaming; creates special permit for the play of electronic versions of instant bingo, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-10SenateContinued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)
2020-02-03SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-03SenateMotion to rerefer to committee agreed to
2020-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2020-01-29SenateCommittee substitute printed 20106901D-S1
2020-01-29SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
2020-01-21SenateAssigned GL&T sub: Gaming
2020-01-06SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2020-01-06SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102349D

Same As/Similar To

SB387 (Carry Over) 2020-02-10 - Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182340.27:1(n/a)See Bill Text
182340.28(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback