VA SB386 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0883)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0883)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Emergency Medical Services Patient Care Information System; trauma data; confidentiality. Authorizes the State Health Commissioner to disclose certain confidential data in the Emergency Medical Services Patient Care Information System, including information, research, or medical data that identifies patients by name or address, to certain entities that seek to improve the delivery of prehospital and hospital emergency medical services, the quality of patient care, and access to medical services or to make other system improvements, if the Commissioner determines that such disclosure is necessary to develop and implement such improvements. The bill requires the Board of Health to develop and approve a policy specific to the sharing of data from the Emergency Medical Services Patient Care Information System.
Title
Emergency Medical Services Patient Care Information System; trauma data, confidentiality.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0883) | |
2020-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 883 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB386ER) |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-03-02 | House | VOTE: Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-02 | House | Passed House (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-02 | House | Read third time |
2020-03-02 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2020-02-28 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-27 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-25 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-13 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Health |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB386S1 |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20106285D-S1 |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20106285D-S1 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102541D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1 | 116.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 116.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |