VA SB385 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
Hearing: Feb 27 in House Room 3
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Professional engineers; regulations, scope of exception. Professional engineers; regulations, scope of exception.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Professional engineers; regulations, scope of exception.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-25HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2020-02-14HouseAssigned GL sub: Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2020-02-13HouseRead first time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-05SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-04SenatePrinted as engrossed 20107043D-ES1
2020-02-04SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendments SB385ES1
2020-02-04SenateAmendments by Senator McPike agreed to
2020-02-04SenateReading of amendments waived
2020-02-04SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20107043D-S1
2020-02-04SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-04SenateRead second time
2020-02-03SenatePassed by for the day
2020-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2020-01-29SenateCommittee substitute printed 20107043D-S1
2020-01-29SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
2020-01-06SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2020-01-06SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102993D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
541401(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback