VA SB385 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-01-30 - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-01-30 - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
Summary
Business, professional and occupational license tax requirements; illegal workers. Requires applicants seeking a local business license to certify that they do not employ persons who cannot provide legal documents proving they are legally eligible to work in the United States.
Title
Business, Professional and Occupational License (BPOL) tax; applicants not to employ illegal worker.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-01-30 | Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-28 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Special on Immigration | |
2008-01-22 | Senate: Rereferred to Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-22 | Senate: Rereferred from Fin. (16-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-08 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2008-01-08 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 082225268 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB385 |