VA SB383 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-08 - Letter sent to the Virginia Conflict of Interest and Ethics Advisory Council
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Lobbying; notification to local clerk; penalty. Requires an individual who is compensated to influence or attempt to influence a local government officer or employee regarding local government action to provide notice of such status to the clerk of the local governing body of the county, city, or town in which the officer or employee serves. The bill requires the notice to be provided to the clerk within 15 days after first communicating or attempting to communicate with a local government officer or employee, along with a $25 fee to be deposited in the general fund of the locality. The notice shall include the name, telephone number, and business address of the compensated individual and shall identify the local government action for which approval is sought. All notices shall expire one calendar year after being filed with a local clerk. The bill requires the notice to be kept as a public record by the clerk for five years. A violation of this requirement is a Class 1 misdemeanor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lobbying; notification to local clerk, penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Local Government with letter (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Local Government (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-08SenateLetter sent to the Virginia Conflict of Interest and Ethics Advisory Council
2020-01-27SenatePassed by indefinitely in Local Government with letter (15-Y 0-N)
2020-01-27SenateReconsidered by Local Government
2020-01-20SenatePassed by indefinitely in Local Government (8-Y 7-N)
2020-01-06SenateReferred to Committee on Local Government
2020-01-06SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103544D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22419(n/a)See Bill Text
22421.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback