VA SB371 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0721)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0721)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local parks; waterway activities; liability. Authorizes a locality or park authority to establish, conduct, and regulate a system of boating, canoeing, kayaking, or tubing activities on waterways and to exercise certain related powers. The bill releases from certain civil liability a locality that establishes such a system or a system of hiking, biking, or horseback riding trails, or the owner of any property leased or licensed for such uses, in the absence of gross negligence or willful misconduct. This bill is identical to HB 220.
Title
Parks, local; waterway activities, liability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (87-Y 10-N) (Y: 87 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (31-Y 9-N) (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Senate requested second conference committee (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (35-Y 5-N) (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (2-Y 37-N) (Y: 2 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (31-Y 9-N) (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Senate requested second conference committee (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (35-Y 5-N) (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (2-Y 37-N) (Y: 2 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0721) | |
2018-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 721 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 26, 2018 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB371ER) |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-10 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (87-Y 10-N) |
2018-03-10 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (87-Y 10-N) |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (31-Y 9-N) |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Senators: Chafin, Cosgrove, Marsden |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Second conferees appointed by Senate |
2018-03-10 | House | Delegates: Marshall, Poindexter, Heretick |
2018-03-10 | House | Second conferees appointed by House |
2018-03-10 | House | House acceded to request for second conference committee |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Senate requested second conference committee (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-10 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Conference substitute printed 18108238D-S1 |
2018-03-09 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (35-Y 5-N) |
2018-03-08 | House | Delegates: Marshall, Poindexter, Heretick |
2018-03-08 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senators: Chafin, Cosgrove, Marsden |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-08 | House | House requested conference committee |
2018-03-08 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2018-03-07 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (2-Y 37-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB371H1 |
2018-03-06 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 18107818D-H1 |
2018-03-06 | House | Read third time |
2018-03-05 | House | Read second time |
2018-03-02 | House | Committee substitute printed 18107818D-H1 |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-26 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2018-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (12-Y 1-N) |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100725D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 1806 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 1809.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |