VA SB370 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-11-30 - Left in Education and Health
Pending: Senate Education and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Delivery of prescription drug orders. Provides that whenever any pharmacy delivers a prescription drug order for which refrigeration is required by mail, common carrier, or delivery service, when the drug order is not personally hand delivered directly, to the patient or his agent at the person's residence or other designated location, the shipment shall include a means for the (i) detection of temperature variations that may cause chemical degradation of the drugs and (ii) notification of the patient of the variation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prescription drugs; delivery of orders.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2019 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-30SenateLeft in Education and Health
2018-02-08SenateContinued to 2019 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2018-01-16SenateAssigned Education sub: Health Professions
2018-01-09SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2018-01-09SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104456D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5413420.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback