VA SB368 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0618)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0618)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Public Procurement Act; architectural and professional engineering term contracts; limitations on project fees; localities. Decreases the population threshold from 78,000 to 50,000 for a locality to qualify for the exceptions from (i) the $150,000 single-project fee limit for architectural and professional engineering term contracts and (ii) the $750,000 annual aggregate total limit for all such projects.
Title
Virginia Public Procurement Act; architectural and professional engineering term contracts.
Sponsors
Sen. John Bell [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0618) | |
2020-04-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 618 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB368ER) |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-03-03 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-03 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-03 | House | Read third time |
2020-03-02 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-27 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-21 | House | Assigned GL sub: Open Government/Procurement |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-02-18 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103623D |